Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, et al v. Cardi Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan and Tammy Beaudreault
Defendant: Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc., C&J Forms, LLC, Cardi Corporation, Cardi Leasing Corp. and Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00574
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time Extending Time for Defendants to File Their Responses to the Complaint Up to and Including January 1, 2019 filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/11/2018. (Dawson, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, Tammy Beaudreault. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Served Summons, #2 Served Summons, #3 Served Summons, #4 Served Summons)(Gursky, Marc)
November 15, 2018 Reset Deadlines: C&J Forms, LLC answer due 12/1/2018; Cardi Corporation answer due 12/1/2018; Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc. answer due 12/1/2018; Cardi Leasing Corp. answer due 12/1/2018; Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC answer due 12/1/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #5 Stipulation filed by Cardi Leasing Corp., Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC, Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc., C&J Forms, LLC, Cardi Corporation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/15/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 10, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Defendants' Time to File Response to the Complaint Up To and Including December 1, 2018 filed by All Defendants. (Dawson, Christopher)
November 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Dawson on behalf of C&J Forms, LLC, Cardi Corporation, Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc., Cardi Leasing Corp., Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC (Dawson, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C&J Forms, LLC, Cardi Corporation, Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc., Cardi Leasing Corp., Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274844 ), filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 251 HEALTH SERVICES AND INSURANCE PLAN, by and through its TRUSTEES, and TAMMY BEAUDREAULT, in her capacity as Administrator of Local 251 HSIP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Gursky, Marc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C&J Forms, LLC, Cardi Corporation, Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc., Cardi Leasing Corp., Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274844 ), filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 251 HEALTH SERVICES AND INSURANCE PLAN, by and through its TRUSTEES, and TAMMY BEAUDREAULT, in her capacity as Administrator of Local 251 HSIP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Gursky, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, et al v. Cardi Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Beaudreault
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardi Corporation Ready Mix Concrete, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J Forms, LLC
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardi Corporation
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardi Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fall River Ready-Mix Concrete, LLC
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?