United Associates, Ltd. v. Dakota Outerwear Co.
Plaintiff: United Associates, Ltd.
Defendant: Dakota Outerwear Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00577
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dakota Outerwear Co.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Dakota Outerwear Co. answer due 12/20/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond To Complaint To December 20, 2018 filed by Dakota Outerwear Co.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Thorvaldsen on behalf of Dakota Outerwear Co. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Associates, Ltd.. Dakota Outerwear Co. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dakota Outerwear Co.. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United Associates, Ltd.. (Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Associates, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent United Associates, Ltd. for United Associates, Ltd... (Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1276207 ), filed by United Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dakota Outerwear Co.. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United Associates, Ltd.. (Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Associates, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent United Associates, Ltd. for United Associates, Ltd... (Maglio, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1276207 ), filed by United Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Maglio, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Associates, Ltd. v. Dakota Outerwear Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Outerwear Co.
Represented By: Kara Thorvaldsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?