DeCapua v. Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: David DeCapua
Defendant: Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00590
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Horton, Dana)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION filed by David DeCapua. (Hutchinson, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan J Ballan. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/28/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Hutchinson. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/28/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Evan J. Ballan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291796 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel M. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291780 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Archis A. Parasharami. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Archis A. Parasharami to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1290960 ) filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 First STIPULATION filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. Horton on behalf of Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Horton, Dana)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1279416 ), filed by David DeCapua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCapua v. Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana M. Horton
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DeCapua
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Evan J Ballan
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?