Barnes v. Amalgamated Transit Union

Plaintiff: Mickeda Barnes
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 618
Case Number: 1:2018cv00594
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/30/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/1/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/31/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 8/30/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/30/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/30/2018; Sonja Deyoe and Carly B. Iafrate participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 11/30/2018 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 618.(Barletta, Barbara)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 618. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6674. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1281014, filed by Amalgamated Transit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Iafrate, Carly)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 618. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6674. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1281014, filed by Amalgamated Transit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Iafrate, Carly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Amalgamated Transit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 618
Represented By: Carly B. Iafrate
Represented By: Gerard P. Cobleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickeda Barnes
Represented By: Sonja L. Deyoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?