Wilson v. Donatoni et al

Plaintiff: Jordan Wilson
Defendant: Travis Donatoni and Donatoni Property Preservation LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00595
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation of Agreement to Accept Service; Travis Donatoni answer due 11/29/2018; Donatoni Property Preservation LLC answer due 11/29/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/9/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #5 Summons Issued Agreement to Acceptance of Service on Behalf of Defendants filed by Jordan Wilson. (Formisano, V.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travis Donatoni, Donatoni Property Preservation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Jordan Wilson. (Formisano, V.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Jordan Wilson. (Formisano, V.)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1281936 ), filed by Jordan Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1281936 ), filed by Jordan Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Donatoni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Donatoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donatoni Property Preservation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Wilson
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?