Pomeranz v. Donatoni Property Preservation LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kyle Pomeranz
Defendant: Travis Donatoni and Donatoni Property Preservation LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00596
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation of Agreement to Accept Service; Travis Donatoni answer due 11/29/2018; Donatoni Property Preservation LLC answer due 11/29/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/9/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #5 Summons Issued Agreement to Acceptance of Service on Behalf of Defendants filed by Kyle Pomeranz. (Formisano, V.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travis Donatoni, Donatoni Property Preservation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Kyle Pomeranz. (Formisano, V.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Kyle Pomeranz. (Formisano, V.)
November 1, 2018 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 18-595-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-595 based upon the indication that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1281951 ), filed by Kyle Pomeranz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1281951 ), filed by Kyle Pomeranz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomeranz v. Donatoni Property Preservation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Donatoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donatoni Property Preservation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Pomeranz
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?