McCarthy v. Wyatt Detention Center
Plaintiff: John J. McCarthy
Defendant: Wyatt Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00609
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff makes clear in his recent filings that he wishes to "withdraw case" and asserts that the Complaint was filed by someone else "without [his] permission". Thus, his request to withdraw this case is GRANTED and the Complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #4 Motion to Withdraw. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/30/2018. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 29, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #4 MOTION to Withdraw Without Payment of Fees referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Without Payment of Fees filed by John J. McCarthy. Responses due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Order of the Court, #3 Danbury Superior Court Documents, #4 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 11/26/2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. In Forma Pauperis form mailed on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. Docket Sheet mailed on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 11/26/2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. In Forma Pauperis form mailed on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. Docket Sheet mailed on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John J. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Wyatt Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?