Griffin v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Griffin
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00631
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Thursday 2/7/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc..(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-4728. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1289392, filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-4728. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1289392, filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Griffin
Represented By: Carly B. Iafrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?