Montilla et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Roselia Montufar, Neris Montilla, Ruben Velasquez and Michael Kyriakakis
Defendant: C.I.T. Bank, N.A., Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Seterus, Inc. and Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2018cv00632
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Noah A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312764 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alison Burton. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/17/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Alison Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312476 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Tieger, Ethan)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A.F. Johnson. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Michael A.F. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal Housing Finance Agency ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1311912 ) filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chava Brandriss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Chava Brandriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310447 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison J Schoenthal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/10/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Allison Schoenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310090 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra G. Watson on behalf of Seterus, Inc. (Watson, Alexandra)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #7 Stipulation, #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Neris Montilla. (Dion, Todd)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association of Withdrawal of Appearance of CIT Bank, N.A. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of C.I.T. Bank, N.A., Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #4 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mr. Cooper. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Michael Kyriakakis, Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Summons Mr. Cooper)(Dion, Todd)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.I.T. Bank, N.A., Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Seterus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1289449 ), filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Dion, Todd)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1289449 ), filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Dion, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montilla et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.I.T. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Michael A.F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Alison Burton
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra G. Watson
Represented By: Allison J Schoenthal
Represented By: Chava Brandriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselia Montufar
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neris Montilla
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Velasquez
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kyriakakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?