Barbosa v. The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island et al

Plaintiff: Isabel Barbosa
Defendant: Care New England Health System and The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2018cv00633
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 1/28/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/25/2019. (Parker, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Care New England Health System answer due 1/14/2019; The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island answer due 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4 Stipulation filed by The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island, Care New England Health System. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by All Defendants. (Parker, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5731. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1289655, filed by The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5731. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1289655, filed by The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa v. The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care New England Health System
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Memorial Hospital of Rhode Island
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Barbosa
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?