Boucher v. Aetna

Plaintiff: Catherine Boucher
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00638
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Pomeroy on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Pomeroy, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 1/16/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/6/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Pomeroy, Scott)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Boucher. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Catherine Boucher (Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Catherine Boucher. (Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1290058 ), filed by Catherine Boucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Catherine Boucher (Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Catherine Boucher. (Bejma, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1290058 ), filed by Catherine Boucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boucher v. Aetna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott K. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Boucher
Represented By: Vicki J. Bejma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?