A.C. et al v. Raimondo et al
Plaintiff: Aleita Cook, Keira Naomi Mendez Rivera, Musah Mohammed Sesay, Mealaktey Sok, Andrea Cahuec Cortez, Justice Womack, Lailani Mendez, Rylie Forcier, Isaiah Mendez, Nancy Xiong, Amaya Womack, Aidan Forcier, June Reser-Hinderer, Micah Santow, L.M., J.R.H., J.W., A.C., A.F., I.M., A.W., N.X., M.M.S., M.S., R.F., A.C.C. and K.N.M.R.
Defendant: Governor Gina M Raimondo, Rhode Island State Board of Education, Commissioner Ken Wagner, Senator Dominick J Ruggerio, Representative Nicholas A Mattiello, Council on Elementary and Secondary Education, Gina M Raimondo, Nicholas A Mattiello, Ken Wagner and Dominick J Ruggerio
Case Number: 1:2018cv00645
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Dominick J Ruggerio waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Nicholas A Mattiello waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Gina M Raimondo waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Wagner. Ken Wagner waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Council on Elementary and Secondary Education. Council on Elementary and Secondary Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhode Island State Board of Education. Rhode Island State Board of Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Council on Elementary and Secondary Education, Nicholas A Mattiello, Gina M Raimondo, Rhode Island State Board of Education, Dominick J Ruggerio, Ken Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Rebell. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/29/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Michael A. Rebell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1292490 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mickman, Jordan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 29, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 29, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: Civil Cover Sheet. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1292239 ), filed by M.S., K.N., M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mickman, Jordan) Modified on 11/29/2018 (Potter, Carrie).
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1292239 ), filed by Mealaktey Sok, Keira Naomi Mendez Rivera, Andrea Cahuec Cortez, Aleita Cook, Justice Womack, Lailani Mendez, Aidan Forcier, Micah Santow, Amaya Womack, Nancy Xiong, June Reser-Hinderer, Rylie Forcier, Musah Mohammed Sesay, Isaiah Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mickman, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C. et al v. Raimondo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleita Cook
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keira Naomi Mendez Rivera
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Musah Mohammed Sesay
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mealaktey Sok
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Cahuec Cortez
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Womack
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lailani Mendez
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rylie Forcier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Mendez
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Xiong
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaya Womack
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aidan Forcier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Reser-Hinderer
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Santow
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.H.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.W.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.W.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.X.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.S.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.C.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.N.M.R.
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gina M Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Ken Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Dominick J Ruggerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Representative Nicholas A Mattiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council on Elementary and Secondary Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina M Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas A Mattiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick J Ruggerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?