O'Brien v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Jeremiah J. O'Brien
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00664
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Carr, Peter)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank N.A... (Carr, Peter)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2018-0405. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1297210, filed by U.S. Bank N.A., Successor Trustee to Bank of America, N.A., successor in interest to LaSalle Bank NA, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Relief from Stay and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order Confirming Plan, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2018-0405. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1297210, filed by U.S. Bank N.A., Successor Trustee to Bank of America, N.A., successor in interest to LaSalle Bank NA, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Relief from Stay and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order Confirming Plan, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah J. O'Brien
Represented By: Americo M. Scungio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?