United States of America v. Lucky Dog LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Destiny Merchandise, LLC, Premier Caging Services, Michael Shine, Lucky Dog LLC, Melissa Pinelli and Meagan Quinn Shine
Case Number: 1:2018cv00668
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Destiny Merchandise, LLC, Lucky Dog LLC, Michael Shine, Melissa Pinelli, Premier Caging Services, Meagan Quinn Shine Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Devereaux, William)
December 19, 2018 Reset Hearings re: Notice of Preliminary Injunction Hearing re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345 is hereby TENTATIVELY re-scheduled to Thursday 2/21/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith; hearing previously scheduled for 12/21/19 is hereby CANCELLED. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Entering #12 Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Associated Dates, And Extending Temporary Restraining Order filed by United States of America. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Associated Dates, And Extending Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. #11 ), on Consent filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference re: TRO held on 12/11/2018; counsel present: Z. Cunha, D. Barton. (Court Reporter L. Schwarm.) (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Injunction Hearing re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345 scheduled for Friday 12/21/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Emergency EX PARTE (UNSEALED) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Destiny Merchandise, LLC, Lucky Dog LLC, Michael Shine, Melissa Pinelli, Premier Caging Services, Meagan Quinn Shine. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Emergency EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345. Notice Sent To: United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cory P. McManus and attached Exhibits, #2 Certificatation of Attorney for the United States Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B), #3 Proposed Order -Proposed TRO and Order to Show Cause)(Cunha, Zachary) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference re: TRO held on 12/11/2018; counsel present: Z. Cunha, D. Barton. (Court Reporter L. Schwarm.) (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Injunction Hearing re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345 scheduled for Friday 12/21/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Emergency EX PARTE (UNSEALED) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Destiny Merchandise, LLC, Lucky Dog LLC, Michael Shine, Melissa Pinelli, Premier Caging Services, Meagan Quinn Shine. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Emergency EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be granted under 18 USC 1345. Notice Sent To: United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cory P. McManus and attached Exhibits, #2 Certificatation of Attorney for the United States Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B), #3 Proposed Order -Proposed TRO and Order to Show Cause)(Cunha, Zachary) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunha, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lucky Dog LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny Merchandise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Caging Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Dog LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Pinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meagan Quinn Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?