Prospect East Holdings, Inc. et al v. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. and Prospect CharterCARE, LLC A Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Our Lady of Fatima Hospital
Defendant: United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00671
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 JUDGMENT in favor of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. against Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc.(Barletta, Barbara)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #16 Motion for Summary Judgment - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 1, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: Notice of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment previously scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is here by CANCELLED. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 11, 2019 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; PLEASE NOTE THE HEARING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 1(Barletta, Barbara)
June 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motions Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(Barletta, Barbara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. re #19 Response to Motion, #23 Response to Motion, #21 Response to Motion (Lindberg, Erika)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Callaci, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. re #21 Response to Motion. (Callaci, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Callaci, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Prospect East Holdings, Inc. re #19 Response to Motion,. (Lindberg, Erika)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE In Opposition to #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment Amended filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Lindberg, Erika)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE In Opposition to #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Lindberg, Erika)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Lindberg, Erika)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Lindberg, Erika)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. in support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #14 Statement of Undisputed Facts . (Callaci, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. (Callaci, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2019. (Callaci, Christopher)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 5/7/2019; Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/21/19 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/11/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
March 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 3/26/2019. Erika J. Lindberg and Christopher Callaci participated. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by All Plaintiffs. (Lindberg, Erika)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. (Callaci, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 3/26/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc..(Lindberg, Erika)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc..(Callaci, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc..(Callaci, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Callaci on behalf of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. (Callaci, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Callaci on behalf of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. (Callaci, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lindberg, Erika)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Our Lady of Fatima Hospital for Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc... (Lindberg, Erika)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299478 ), filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lindberg, Erika)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299478 ), filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lindberg, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prospect East Holdings, Inc. et al v. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Callaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCARE, LLC
Represented By: Erika J. Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect East Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Erika J. Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCARE, LLC A Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Our Lady of Fatima Hospital
Represented By: Erika J. Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?