Ricon Construction, LLC v. Watson Enterprises International, LLC

Plaintiff: RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Defendant: Watson Enterprises International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00676
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Deadline Updated: Watson Enterprises International, LLC answer now due 2/18/2019. (Perry, Frank)
January 22, 2019 STIPULATION ENTERED by Chief Judge William E. Smith: Upon consideration of stipulation, it is hereby ordered that Defendant Watson EnterprisesInternational, LLC may have up to and including February 18, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. (Perry, Frank)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Late Entry filed by Watson Enterprises International, LLC. (Oliverio, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Oliverio on behalf of Watson Enterprises International, LLC (Oliverio, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Ricon Construction, LLC for Summons and Complaint Watson Enterprises International, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kohm, Katharine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Watson Enterprises International, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1300597 ), filed by RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pogue, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1300597 ), filed by RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pogue, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricon Construction, LLC v. Watson Enterprises International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Pogue
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Enterprises International, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?