Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Aloisio, et al

Plaintiff: Rhythm Wrangler Music, Harlan Howard Songs, Inc., Round Hill Music, LP, Tokeco Tunes, Songs of Universal, Inc., Groper Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC. and Broadcast Music, Inc
Defendant: JMA, Inc. and Joseph Aloisio
Case Number: 1:2018cv00682
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery to close by 8/15/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/16/2019; So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 2/14/2019; James A. Musgrave and John C. Manni participated (Barletta, Barbara)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Musgrave, James)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Manni, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 2/14/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by JMA, Inc..(Manni, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc. Joseph Aloisio served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Musgrave, James)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 1:18cv00682JJMPAS ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Aloisio.(Manni, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc. Joseph Aloisio served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Musgrave, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc, Groper Music, Harlan Howard Songs, Inc., Rhythm Wrangler Music, Round Hill Music, LP, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC., Tokeco Tunes identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Musgrave, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joseph Aloisio, JMA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Musgrave, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Musgrave, James)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1301606 ), filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc. ,Harlan Howard Songs, Inc., Groper Music ,Rhythm Wrangler Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC. ,Tokeco Tunes , Round Hill Music, LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Musgrave, James) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1301606 ), filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc. ,Harlan Howard Songs, Inc., Groper Music ,Rhythm Wrangler Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC. ,Tokeco Tunes , Round Hill Music, LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Musgrave, James) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Aloisio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhythm Wrangler Music
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan Howard Songs, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Hill Music, LP
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groper Music
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs, LLC.
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc
Represented By: James A. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMA, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Manni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Aloisio
Represented By: John C. Manni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?