West v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Janice Bradford West and Merle West
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Sears Roebuck & Co., Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company, Warren Pumps, Grinnell LLC, New Yorker Boiler Company, ECR International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, F.W. Webb Company, Kimberly-Clark Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Trane Co., Sappi Fine Paper North America, Flowserve Corporation, Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, General Electric Company, Dezurik, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Aurora Pump Company, Peerless Pumps, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Allied Glove Corporation, Gardner-Denver Inc., New England Insulation, Inc., Rainbird Corporation, International Paper Company, The Gage Company, Viacom, Inc., Albany International, Bell & Gossett, Gould Pumps, Packings & Insulations Corporation, Crane Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Hammond Valve Company, Milwaukee Valve Company, Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., BSM Pump Corp., The Wm. Powell Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Eaton Corporation, CBS Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc, P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Cianbro Corporation and Genuine Parts Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00688
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Catherine A. Mohan. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/15/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Catherine A. Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1325323 ) filed by General Electric Company. (Shannon, Anne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 98 First MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maine filed by CBS Corporation. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Lyons, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company in support of #91 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Daly, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 96 First CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against CBS Corporation, filed by CBS Corporation.(Lyons, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 95 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Fourth, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 94 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Third, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 93 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint Second, Amended CROSSCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by General Electric Company. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Shannon, Anne) (Main Document 91 replaced on 2/5/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Simoncelli, Michael).
February 1, 2019 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Glove Corporation. (Souza, Kristen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Crane Company re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Goldman, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company.(Daly, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint JURY DEMAND by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony)
January 24, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony)
January 23, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's 4 Amended by The Gage Company.(Aprea, Anthony) ISSUSED IN ERROR DUE TO CAPTION ON FIRST PAGE Modified on 1/24/2019 (Jackson, Kerrie).
January 23, 2019 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company. (Daly, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint With Special Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Rainbird Corporation.(Wheelock, Jennifer) Docket text Modified on 1/18/2019 (Simoncelli, Michael).
January 18, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps.(Roman, Marisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Roman, Marisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Gardner-Denver Inc..(Roman, Marisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Cross-Claims by Bayer Cropscience.(Nelson, Monica)
January 17, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Special Defenses against All Defendants by Allied Glove Corporation.(Souza, Kristen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCaffrey on behalf of Gould Pumps (McCaffrey, Kevin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Sappi Fine Paper North America.(Mee, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Sappi Fine Paper North America (Mee, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rainbird Corporation. (Wheelock, Jennifer)
January 14, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Waksler, Craig)
January 14, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Waksler, Craig)
January 14, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Allied Glove Corporation (Souza, Kristen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 66 Defendant, Cianbro Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint OF THE PLAINTIFFS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cianbro Corporation.(Fielding, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Fielding on behalf of Cianbro Corporation (Fielding, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cianbro Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Cianbro Companies for Cianbro Corporation.. (Fielding, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Dwyer, Paul)
January 11, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
January 9, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Harten on behalf of The Gage Company (Harten, Stephen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Aprea on behalf of The Gage Company (Aprea, Anthony)
January 9, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Gage Company. (Aprea, Anthony)
January 9, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (McVinney, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Costa, Kenneth)
January 9, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Costa on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Costa, Kenneth)
January 9, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Goldman, David)
January 8, 2019 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell & Gossett. (Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Bell & Gossett.(Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC.. (Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (With Special Defenses) by Grinnell LLC.(Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Bell & Gossett (Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Mee on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Mee, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Armstrong Pumps, Inc. for Armstrong Pumps, Inc... (Romano, Alex)
January 8, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dezurik, Inc.. (Murphy, Ryan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Murphy, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Murphy, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Murphy, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Wheelock on behalf of Rainbird Corporation (Wheelock, Jennifer)
January 7, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sid Harvey Industries, Inc.. (Zabbo, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Zabbo on behalf of Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. (Zabbo, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Shipp. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J Cirilano. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 4, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wm. Powell Company. (Dighello, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Dighello, Jr. on behalf of The Wm. Powell Company (Dighello, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Jason T Shipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1307654 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent)
January 4, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Joseph J. Cirilano to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1307652 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent)
January 4, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane Co.. (Fielding, Brian)
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company. (Vellucci, Margreta)
January 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Vellucci, Margreta)
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Felice, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric Company.. (Shannon, Anne)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECR International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BDR Thermea Group, BV for ECR International, Inc... (Goldman, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Feeney, Cassandra)
December 31, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex A. Romano on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Romano, Alex)
December 31, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D. Urbanski on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
December 29, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by CBS Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Lyons, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Matteo on behalf of Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company (Matteo, Nicole)
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Daly on behalf of Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company (Daly, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience. (Nelson, Monica)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Bayer Cropscience (Nelson, Monica)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 2 of 2)(Potter, Carrie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps. (Roman, Marisa)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Roman, Marisa)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner-Denver Inc.. (Roman, Marisa)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of Warren Pumps (Roman, Marisa)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Roman, Marisa)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of Gardner-Denver Inc. (Roman, Marisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of ECR International, Inc. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kimberly-Clark Corp.. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corp. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Insulation, Inc.. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of New England Insulation, Inc. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Goldman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Company (Goldman, David)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Lyons, III on behalf of CBS Corporation (Lyons, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 18-6293. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1303295, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shannon, Anne)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Lyons, III on behalf of CBS Corporation (Lyons, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 18-6293. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1303295, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shannon, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Mark O. Denehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps
Represented By: Marisa K. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Yorker Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Cassandra L. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.W. Webb Company
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corp.
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Co.
Represented By: Brian A. Fielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sappi Fine Paper North America
Represented By: Peter J. Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Michael F. McVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Murphy
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Ryan M. Murphy
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Alex A. Romano
Represented By: Theodorus D. Urbanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Glove Corporation
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner-Denver Inc.
Represented By: Marisa K. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Insulation, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbird Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer E. Wheelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: James P. Ruggeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gage Company
Represented By: Anthony S. Aprea
Represented By: Stephen P. Harten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Peter J. Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps
Represented By: Kevin C. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packings & Insulations Corporation
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Valve Company
Represented By: Jennifer E. Wheelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Harvey Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSM Pump Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wm. Powell Company
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Marisa K. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.I.C. Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cianbro Corporation
Represented By: Brian A. Fielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Bradford West
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Robert J. McConnell
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp
Represented By: Joseph J Cirilano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle West
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Robert J. McConnell
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp
Represented By: Joseph J Cirilano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?