Anderle v. The Interstate Navigation Company

Plaintiff: Ellen B. Anderle
Defendant: The Interstate Navigation Company d/b/a The Block Island Ferry and The Interstate Navigation Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Fulweiler, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 3/8/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. The Rule 16 conference will be scheduled as soon as possible, either in person or by telephone. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/7/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Interstate Navigation Company.(Blatchley, Samuel)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of The Interstate Navigation Company (Blatchley, Samuel)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen B. Anderle. The Interstate Navigation Company served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Fulweiler, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Interstate Navigation Company. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1307774 ), filed by Ellen B. Anderle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderle v. The Interstate Navigation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Interstate Navigation Company d/b/a The Block Island Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Interstate Navigation Company
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen B. Anderle
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?