Christy v. United States of America

Plaintiff: David A. Christy
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Summons returned executed as to incorrectly. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David A. Christy. United States of America served on 2/11/2019 answer due 4/12/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David A. Christy. David A. Christy served on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 USA)(Christy, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David A. Christy. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 UMMONS)(Christy, David)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/9/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 8, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by David A. Christy. (Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021731 ), filed by David A. Christy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version.(Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by David A. Christy. (Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021731 ), filed by David A. Christy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version.(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christy v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?