Cavanaugh v. State of Rhode Island

Petitioner: John Cavanaugh
Respondent: State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Motion to Relocate Filed. Notice Sent To: State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Relocate, #2 Supporting Memorandum Motion to Relocate, #3 Appendix Motion to Relocate, #4 Appendix Motion to Relocate)(McGinn, Virginia) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot. Petitioner paid the required $5.00 filing fee on January 28, 2019 #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/6/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond State of Rhode Island Response due by 2/28/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/29/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14670021793 (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by John Cavanaugh. (Jackson, Kerrie) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/6/2019) (Urizandi, Nisshy).
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by John Cavanaugh in support of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 1/29/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/8/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Cavanaugh. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court Opinion, #2 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #3 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 1/29/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/8/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Cavanaugh. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court Opinion, #2 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #3 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Aaron L. Weisman
Represented By: Virginia M. McGinn
Represented By: Christopher R. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?