Solibelle, LLC et al v. City of Pawtucket et al

Plaintiff: Solibelle, LLC, Apex Development Company, LLC, Pilavin Properties, LLC and Forest, LLC
Defendant: City of Pawtucket, Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency., Municipal Defendants and Pawtucket City Council Members
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/24/2019) (Barletta, Barbara).
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time and then to Stay the Litigation filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #3 Stipulation filed by all parties - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/18/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2019; Timothy K. Baldwin, Joseph Whelan and Ted Orson participated (Barletta, Barbara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Orson on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency. (Orson, Theodore)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Friday, 1/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whelan, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1312452 ), filed by Apex Development Company, LLC, Forest, LLC, Pilavin Properties, LLC, Solibelle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - City of Pawtucket, #3 Summons - Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency, #4 Pawtucket City Council Members, #5 Summons - Municipal Defendants)(Whelan, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Orson on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency. (Orson, Theodore)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Friday, 1/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whelan, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1312452 ), filed by Apex Development Company, LLC, Forest, LLC, Pilavin Properties, LLC, Solibelle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - City of Pawtucket, #3 Summons - Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency, #4 Pawtucket City Council Members, #5 Summons - Municipal Defendants)(Whelan, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solibelle, LLC et al v. City of Pawtucket et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pawtucket
Represented By: Theodore Orson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawtucket Redevelopment Agency.
Represented By: Theodore Orson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawtucket City Council Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solibelle, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilavin Properties, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?