Olofinlade v. Atmed Treatment Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Folosade Olofinlade
Defendant: Atmed Treatment Center, Inc., Joseph Chiodo, Johnston Police Department, Johnston Fire Department, Town of Johnston and William Conloy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Atmed Treatment Center, Inc. answer due 3/20/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/27/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Atmed Treatment Center, Inc.. (Silveira, Lori)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Joseph Chiodo answer due 3/20/2019; Johnston Police Department answer due 3/20/2019; Town of Johnston answer due 3/20/2019- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Chiodo, Town of Johnston. (Hilton, Kathleen)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Atmed Treatment Center, Inc. answer due 2/22/2019; Town of Johnston answer due 2/22/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Chiodo, William Conloy, Johnston Fire Department, Johnston Police Department, Town of Johnston. (Hilton, Kathleen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atmed Treatment Center, Inc., Joseph Chiodo, Town of Johnston filed by Folosade Olofinlade.(Barletta, Barbara)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to amend the complaint without prejudice to Defendants' right to assert any and all defenses to the federal claim in the responsive pleadings and/or disposition motions. Defendants are granted up to and including 2/15/19 to file their answers or responsive pleadings - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/24/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2017-4819. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1312464, filed by Atmed Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silveira, Lori) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers.
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2017-4819. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1312464, filed by Atmed Treatment Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silveira, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olofinlade v. Atmed Treatment Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Folosade Olofinlade
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmed Treatment Center, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Caron Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Chiodo
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Fire Department
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Johnston
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Conloy
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?