Breda v. University Internal Medicine, Inc.
Plaintiff: John A Breda
Defendant: University Internal Medicine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 4/3/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University Internal Medicine, Inc.. (Zambarano, Kyle)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by University Internal Medicine, Inc..(Zambarano, Kyle)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A Breda. University Internal Medicine, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Muri, Anthony)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University Internal Medicine, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/25/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1314518 ), filed by John A Breda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Muri, Anthony)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University Internal Medicine, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1314518 ), filed by John A Breda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Muri, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breda v. University Internal Medicine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Internal Medicine, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Breda
Represented By: Anthony F. Muri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?