Kozlov et al v. Brown University

Plaintiff: Maxwell D Kozlov, Benjamin D Bosis, Desiree J Acevedo, Jessica Dawn Tennis, Katherine Jimenez, Zachary James Farrias, Alec Brown, Lucas Gregory Smolcic Larson, Andrea Marie Bennett, Geetansali Gunanathan, Blake Wilkinson, Jorge Gutierrez Sanabria, Joseph M Fleming and Benjamin Potee
Defendant: Brown University in Providence in the State of Rhode Island and Providence Plantations and Brown University
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Katherine Jimenez (Sinapi, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brown University identifying Corporate Parent Brown University for Brown University.. (Green, James)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and a Response to #6 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Collective Action; Reset Deadlines: Brown University answer due 5/13/2019 and Responses due by 5/13/2019. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #6 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Collective Action filed by Brown University. Responses due by 3/6/2019. (Jusczyk, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin D Bosis, Maxwell D Kozlov. Brown University served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Sinapi, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Jorge Gutierrez Sanabria (Sinapi, Richard)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Joseph M Fleming (Sinapi, Richard)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Lucas Gregory Smolcic Larson (Sinapi, Richard)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Blake Wilkinson (Sinapi, Richard)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Benjamin Potee (Sinapi, Richard)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Jessica Dawn Tennis (Sinapi, Richard)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Desiree J Acevedo (Sinapi, Richard)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Andrea Marie Bennett (Sinapi, Richard)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Geetanjali Gunanathan (Sinapi, Richard) Modified on 1/31/2019 to correct typo in name (Barletta, Barbara).
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Alec Brown (Sinapi, Richard)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Zachary James Farrias (Sinapi, Richard)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hillary J. Massey. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Benjamin D Bosis (Sinapi, Richard)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Hillary Massey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316575 ) filed by Brown University. (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 1/29/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Maxwell D Kozlov (Sinapi, Richard)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry J. Miller. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Collective Action filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Sinapi, Richard)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Barry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316573 ) filed by Brown University. (Jusczyk, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Jusczyk on behalf of Brown University (Jusczyk, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315146 ), filed by Maxwell D Kozlov, Benjamin D Bosis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315146 ), filed by Maxwell D Kozlov, Benjamin D Bosis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlov et al v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell D Kozlov
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin D Bosis
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree J Acevedo
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Dawn Tennis
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Jimenez
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary James Farrias
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Brown
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Gregory Smolcic Larson
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Marie Bennett
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geetansali Gunanathan
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Wilkinson
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Gutierrez Sanabria
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Fleming
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Potee
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University in Providence in the State of Rhode Island and Providence Plantations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Barry J. Miller
Represented By: Hillary J. Massey
Represented By: Michael E. Jusczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?