Sowa et al v. Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB

Plaintiff: Paula Thibodeau, Joseph J. Sowa and Pamela A. Sowa
Defendant: Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB.(Gainor, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB answer due 3/21/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #8 Stipulation filed by Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB. (Main, Robin-Lee)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin-Lee Main on behalf of Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB (Main, Robin-Lee)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB (Gainor, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Joseph J. Sowa, Pamela A. Sowa, Paula Thibodeau. (Blackman, Charles)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Joseph J. Sowa, Pamela A. Sowa, Paula Thibodeau. (Blackman, Charles)CLERKS NOTE: Docket entry was filed incorrectly and re-filed correctly as ECF #4. Please disregard. Modified on 1/29/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315779 ), filed by Joseph J. Sowa, Paula Thibodeau, Pamela A. Sowa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1986 Trust, #2 Exhibit First Amendment, #3 Exhibit Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit Trustee Resignation, #6 Exhibit 2004 Amended and Restated Trust, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Blackman, Charles)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315779 ), filed by Joseph J. Sowa, Paula Thibodeau, Pamela A. Sowa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1986 Trust, #2 Exhibit First Amendment, #3 Exhibit Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit Trustee Resignation, #6 Exhibit 2004 Amended and Restated Trust, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Blackman, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowa et al v. Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Thibodeau
Represented By: Charles D. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Sowa
Represented By: Charles D. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela A. Sowa
Represented By: Charles D. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Personal Trust Company FSB
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Robin-Lee Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?