Senay v. Salve Regina University

Plaintiff: Joanna S Senay
Defendant: Salve Regina University
Case Number: 1:2019cv00050
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Salve Regina University.(Baldwin, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION filed by Salve Regina University. (Baldwin, Timothy)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Salve Regina University up to and including 3/4/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time filed by Salve Regina University. (Baldwin, Timothy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2018-1040. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1319373, filed by Salve Regina University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2018-1040. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1319373, filed by Salve Regina University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Senay v. Salve Regina University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna S Senay
Represented By: Robert E. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salve Regina University
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?