Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP

Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Finkel on behalf of Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP (Finkel, Marc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren D. Hutchison on behalf of Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP (Hutchison, Warren)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP. (Potter, Carrie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cooke, Crystal)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper.. (Cooke, Crystal)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1320286 ), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver)(Cooke, Crystal)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper.. (Cooke, Crystal)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1320286 ), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver)(Cooke, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP
Represented By: Marc E. Finkel
Represented By: Warren D. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Crystal L. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Crystal L. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?