Robinson v. PACE Organization of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: Karissa-Lee Robinson and Karissa-Lee D. Robinson
Defendant: PACE Organization of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan to be scheduled within the next 4 weeks. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 4/1/2019: counsel on call: M. Gagliardi; B. Davis (Jackson, Ryan)
March 31, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Karissa-Lee D. Robinson. (Gagliardi, Mark)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Monday 4/1/2019 at 11:30 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet, via email at least 24 hours prior to the call. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by PACE Organization of Rhode Island.(Davis, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Davis on behalf of PACE Organization of Rhode Island (Davis, Benjamin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION For Additional Time To File Responsive Pleading filed by PACE Organization of Rhode Island. (Campbell, Christopher)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6799. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1321043, filed by PACE Organization of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - to Notice of Removal, #4 B - to Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Campbell, Christopher)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6799. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1321043, filed by PACE Organization of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - to Notice of Removal, #4 B - to Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Campbell, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. PACE Organization of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACE Organization of Rhode Island
Represented By: Christopher J. Campbell
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karissa-Lee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karissa-Lee D. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?