Alabede v. Logisticare Solutions, LLC

Plaintiff: Rasaq Alabede
Defendant: Logisticare Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in favor of Logisticare Solutions, LLC against Rasaq Alabede(Barletta, Barbara)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All the claims alleged in the lawsuit are required to be arbitrated according to the contract, and therefore the Court exercises its discretion to dismiss the Complaint. If the Plaintiff's #5 objection/motion is a motion to remand, that is DENIED because this Court has diversity jurisdiction because the Plaintiff is from Rhode Island and the Defendant is incorporated in Delaware with a principal place of business in Georgia - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/14/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Rasaq Alabede. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Russo, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Horne, Melissa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8895. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324605, filed by Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Def's Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Horne, Melissa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8895. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324605, filed by Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Def's Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Horne, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabede v. Logisticare Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasaq Alabede
Represented By: Robert Vito Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logisticare Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Melissa M. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?