The Washington Trust Company v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Washington Trust Company
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response up to and including 4/19/19 filed by The Washington Trust Company. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/3/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by The Washington Trust Company. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/22/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Attached Agreement Filed. Notice Sent To: CitiMortgage, Inc., The Washington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(DiBartolo, CharCretia) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Washington Trust Company. CitiMortgage, Inc. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
March 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines: CitiMortgage, Inc. answer due 3/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #5 Stipulation to Extend time to answer up to and including 3/14/19 filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by The Washington Trust Company. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Louis Bonacorsi. - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/21/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Louis Bonacorsi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1327330 ) filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (DiBartolo, CharCretia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (DiBartolo, CharCretia)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CharCretia V. DiBartolo on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (DiBartolo, CharCretia)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0034. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324647, filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit A to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(DiBartolo, CharCretia)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0034. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324647, filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit A to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(DiBartolo, CharCretia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Washington Trust Company v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Washington Trust Company
Represented By: Andrew R. Bilodeau
Represented By: Ryanna T. Capalbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: CharCretia V. DiBartolo
Represented By: Louis F. Bonacorsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?