Branch v. DK Power, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Branch
Defendant: DK Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/1/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/1/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/2/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/2/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/3/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/1/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 4/1/2019; David Jesse Oliveira and Mark P. Dolan participated (Barletta, Barbara)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT Of Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Oliveira, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by DK Power, Inc.. (Dolan, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 4/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of All Defendants (Dolan, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by DK Power, Inc..(Dolan, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DK Power, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Elisabeth Branch. (Oliveira, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Elisabeth Branch. (Oliveira, David)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1324975 ), filed by Elisabeth Branch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliveira, David)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1324975 ), filed by Elisabeth Branch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliveira, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. DK Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DK Power, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Branch
Represented By: David Jesse Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?