Hanley v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mary A. Hanley
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00073
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT and Summary of Facts by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Pomeroy, Scott)
March 8, 2019 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED to Thursday, 4/18/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 4/1/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 3/2/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/6/2019. (Pomeroy, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-0201. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1325245, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pomeroy, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-0201. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1325245, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pomeroy, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanley v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott K. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Hanley
Represented By: Frederick A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?