United States of America v. 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, RI
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, Rhode Island
Claimant: Yong Xiong Lei
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Vacate #5 Order on Motion for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Replies due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Rogers, Mary)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: #6 Motion to Vacate scheduled for Wednesday 4/3/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate #5 Order on Motion for Writ filed by Yong Xiong Lei. Responses due by 4/2/2019. (DiLibero, Steven)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM Verified Claim of Ownership by Yong Xiong Lei. (DiLibero, Steven)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Yong Xiong Lei.(DiLibero, Steven)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, RI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 8 Clay Street, Hopkinton, Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Yong Xiong Lei
Represented By: Steven D. DiLibero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?