Studley v. Jacobowitz et al
Plaintiff: David Studley
Defendant: Pearl H. Jacobowitz and Irwin Jacobowitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00086
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Reconsideration, filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McGuire, Vickie)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #12 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. Responses due by 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. This Court did not take any position on the jurisdiction of the state court, or the propriety of the Plaintiff's complaint. The Court merely ruled that there is no subject matter federal jurisdiction - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #12 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. Responses due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court - Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/3/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by David Studley. Amendment to #10 Reply to Response, Amended Supporting Memo. (Coogan, Kayla)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #8 Response to Motion Response to Defendants' Objection filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Supporting Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Coogan, Kayla)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Supplement by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz in support of #8 Response to Motion. (Potter, Carrie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. Replies due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memo in Support of Motion to Remand)(Coogan, Kayla)
February 25, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-cv-84-JJM-PAS this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/25/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against David Studley by Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against David Studley by Irwin Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 State Record)(Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County District Court, case number 3CA-2018-10054., filed by Pearl H. Jacobowitz, Irwin Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-84 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 State Record)(Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County District Court, case number 3CA-2018-10054., filed by Pearl H. Jacobowitz, Irwin Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-84 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Studley v. Jacobowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Studley
Represented By: Steven J. Hart
Represented By: Kayla E. Coogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl H. Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?