Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3 v. Wilson, III et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3
Defendant: Sabrina Petrarca, VNA Care of New England, Lisa M. Wilson, Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC and Mason P. Wilson, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC.(Buckley, Patricia)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3 identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3.. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation Extending Deadlines; Reset Deadlines: Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC answer due 4/26/2019 - So Order by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/25/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for Response filed by Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC. (Buckley, Patricia)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Buckley on behalf of Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC (Buckley, Patricia)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa M. Wilson, Mason P. Wilson, III.(DeMarco, Paul)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. Sabrina Petrarca served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. VNA Care of New England served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. Lisa M. Wilson served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. Mason P. Wilson, III served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329049 ), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - L. Wilson, #4 Summons - M. Wilson, #5 Summons - Dunkin Engineering, #6 Summons - S. Petrarca, #7 Summons - VNA)(Tadesse, Krystle)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329049 ), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - L. Wilson, #4 Summons - M. Wilson, #5 Summons - Dunkin Engineering, #6 Summons - S. Petrarca, #7 Summons - VNA)(Tadesse, Krystle)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3 v. Wilson, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2006-HE3 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE3
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Petrarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VNA Care of New England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. Wilson
Represented By: Paul DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunkin Engineering Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Patricia A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason P. Wilson, III
Represented By: Paul DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?