Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. GPS-GILS Property Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffrey Kobak, Trilogy WBO Realty Limited Partnership, GPS-GILS Property Services LLC, Ahlborg Construction Corp, West Bay Orthopedics and Neurosurgery, Inc and Blackstone Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Blackstone Management, LLC.(Angelone, Thomas)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Angelone on behalf of Blackstone Management, LLC (Angelone, Thomas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Atain Specialty Insurance Company by Ahlborg Construction Corp.(DeLuca, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. DeLuca on behalf of Ahlborg Construction Corp (DeLuca, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Kobak. (Potter, Carrie)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Request filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. West Bay Orthopedics and Neurosurgery, Inc served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Blackstone Management, LLC waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to West Bay Orthopedics and Neurosurgery, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blackstone Management, LLC. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GPS-GILS Property Services LLC. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329496 ), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 waiver, #4 waiver, #5 waiver, #6 waiver, #7 summons)(Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to West Bay Orthopedics and Neurosurgery, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blackstone Management, LLC. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GPS-GILS Property Services LLC. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329496 ), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 waiver, #4 waiver, #5 waiver, #6 waiver, #7 summons)(Perkins, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. GPS-GILS Property Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew W. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kobak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trilogy WBO Realty Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPS-GILS Property Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahlborg Construction Corp
Represented By: Michael R. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bay Orthopedics and Neurosurgery, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Management, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?