DePalma v. United States of America Veterans Administration et al

Plaintiff: Ronald L. DePalma
Defendant: United States of America Veterans Administration, Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy, 21st Century Oncology, Inc., Roger Williams Hospital and M.D. John Coen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00107
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint filed by Roger Williams Hospital, Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy. Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Kelly, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Roger Williams Hospital answer due 5/1/2019; Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy answer due 5/1/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Galamaga on behalf of Roger Williams Hospital (Galamaga, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Pursuant to the #6 Stipulation, the correct deadlines for 21st Century Oncology, Inc. and John Coen, M.D. to answer is 5/10/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulation filed by Roger Williams Hospital. (Galamaga, Paul)
April 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: John Coen answer due 4/10/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines: John Coen answer due 4/9/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. DePalma. John Coen served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Barone, Ernest)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. DePalma. 21st Century Oncology, Inc. served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Barone, Ernest)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. DePalma. United States of America Veterans Administration served on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Barone, Ernest)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadline 21st Century Oncology, Inc. answer due 5/10/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/11/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. DePalma. Roger Williams Hospital served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Barone, Ernest)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION filed by 21st Century Oncology, Inc., John Coen. (Carr, Angela)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Carr on behalf of 21st Century Oncology, Inc., John Coen (Carr, Angela)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K. Deady on behalf of 21st Century Oncology, Inc., John Coen (Deady, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 21st Century Oncology, Inc., John Coen, Roger Williams Hospital, Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1330531 ), filed by Ronald L. DePalma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Form 95, #2 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit VA Acknowledgment Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Four Summons to be signed by Clerk)(Barone, Ernest) Modified on 3/5/2019 (McGuire, Vickie).CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers.
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 21st Century Oncology, Inc., John Coen, Roger Williams Hospital, Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1330531 ), filed by Ronald L. DePalma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Form 95, #2 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit VA Acknowledgment Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Four Summons to be signed by Clerk)(Barone, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DePalma v. United States of America Veterans Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams Hospital Radiation Therapy
Represented By: Matthew D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Oncology, Inc.
Represented By: Angela L. Carr
Represented By: Ryan K. Deady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams Hospital
Represented By: Paul F. Galamaga
Represented By: Matthew D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. John Coen
Represented By: Angela L. Carr
Represented By: Ryan K. Deady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. DePalma
Represented By: Ernest J. Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?