Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. et al v. Michael Conklin, Jr.

Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCare LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC and Prospect East Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Michael E. Conklin, JR.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-09131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #28 is denied without prejudice subject to refiling pursuant to the Local Rules of the District of Rhode Island. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
February 7, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr. to Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition, #38 to Plaintiff's Transfer Brief (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Steven J. Thompson in Support of Defendants Memorandum in Support of Transfer)(Pritchett, Sydney)
February 7, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.to Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support #37 Opposing Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) (Reichert, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the 2/7/2019 Scheduling Conference is hereby vacated pending review of the parties' briefing related to transfer of venue. No appearances are required on 2/7/2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Transfer Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #36 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas V. Reichert, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Reichert, Thomas)
January 31, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven J. Thompson In Support of Defendant's Memorandum In Support of Transfer)(Pritchett, Sydney)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: BRIEFING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv)
January 18, 2019 Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #28 is taken off the 1/24/2019 calendar and placed under submission. The Scheduling Conference is hereby continued for hearing to 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM. No appearances are required on 1/24/2019. An order with the court's ruling on the pending motion will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2019 Filing 34 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rhow, Ekwan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(B)(6) and 9(B) #28 filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. (Pritchett, Sydney)
January 4, 2019 Filing 32 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 01/04/2019 to Christopher Lee for payment made on 12/05/2018 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #22 #25 . (rdj)
January 3, 2019 Filing 31 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(B)(6) and 9(B) #28 filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Reichert, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION #29 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from January 10, 2019 to January 24, 2019 filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reichert, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(B)(6) and 9(B) filed by defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Steven J. Thompson, #3 Declaration of Michael E. Conklin, Jr., #4 Proposed Order) (Pritchett, Sydney)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Complaint #22 , for the following reasons: filed incorrectly. Plaintiff re-filed the Amended Complaint correctly at #23 . (vdr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the filing of a First Amended Complaint #23 , the Motion to Dismiss #17 is deemed moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #22 filed by Plaintiff Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. *Incorrect Event utilized to docket First Amended Complaint. Correct event utilized and document re-filed at Dkt. 23. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #22 , filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Appendix)(Rhow, Ekwan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 **STRICKEN** COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22847212 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Appendix)(Rhow, Ekwan) Modified on 12/7/2018 (vdr).
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INTENT TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by PLAINTIFFS Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Irene Scholl Tatevosyan counsel for Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. Adding Sydney Pritchett as counsel of record for Michael E. Conklin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Irene Scholl Tatevosyan counsel for Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. Irene Scholl-Tatevosyan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Dismiss) (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING #11 #14 Non-Resident Attorney Steven J. Thompson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr., designating Irene Scholl-Tatevosyan as local counsel. (lt)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's response to initial complaint is continued to November 14, 2018. (iv)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven J. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/31/2018, Receipt No. 26D7GUJS) filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven J. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22670148) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 11/14/2018 filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application) (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven J. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22670148) filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr..(Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, Jr., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on October 25, 2018. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, JR.. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, JR., identifying Defendant - Michael E. Conklin; Plaintiff - Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.; Plaintiff - Prospect East Holdings, Inc.; Plaintiff - Prospect Chartercare, LLC; Plaintiff - Prospect Chartercare SJHSRI, LLC; Plaintiff - Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Irene Scholl-Tatevosyan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, JR.. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, JR.. (Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number BC722629 Receipt No: 0973-22633159 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Michael E. Conklin, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-2 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Irene Scholl Tatevosyan added to party Michael E. Conklin, JR.(pty:dft))(Scholl Tatevosyan, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. et al v. Michael Conklin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCare LLC
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect East Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Conklin, JR.
Represented By: Sydney Rose Pritchett
Represented By: Irene Scholl Tatevosyan
Represented By: Steven J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?