Arruda v. Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Arruda
Defendant: Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc., John A/ Pezzullo, III and John A. Pezzullo, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv00133
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by All Defendants. (Khorsand, Ali)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #13 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/5/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 11/6/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/6/2019; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/6/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 2/6/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 3/6/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/6/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation to dismiss Counts I and II as to John A. Pezzullo, III - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/6/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION filed by Wayne Arruda. (Herman, Louise)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John A. Pezzullo, III. Responses due by 5/3/2019. (Brooks, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by John A. Pezzullo, III, Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc..(Brooks, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Repond to Complaint. Reset Deadlines: John A. Pezzullo, III answer due 4/20/2019 - So Order by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Khorsand, Ali)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by John A/ Pezzullo, III, Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc. Wthdrawal of Appearance (McNamara, Neal)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Khorsand on behalf of All Defendants (Khorsand, Ali)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Brooks on behalf of All Defendants (Brooks, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Beretta, Jr. on behalf of All Defendants (Beretta, Richard)
March 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-1624. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1336245, filed by John A/ Pezzullo, III, Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chittick, Michael)
March 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arruda v. Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Medical Imaging, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Chittick
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Represented By: Richard R. Beretta, Jr.
Represented By: Robert P. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A/ Pezzullo, III
Represented By: Michael D. Chittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Pezzullo, III
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Represented By: Richard R. Beretta, Jr.
Represented By: Robert P. Brooks
Represented By: Michael D. Chittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Arruda
Represented By: Louise A. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?