Mazzarese v. Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation, et al

Plaintiff: Nubia Mazzarese
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company and Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jean E. Tomasco. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jean E. Tomasco to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1388536 ) filed by Hartford Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Insurance Company. Nubia Mazzarese waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Horton, Dana)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Assented STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Meshantucket Pequot Tribal Nation filed by Hartford Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. Horton on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company (Horton, Dana)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Insurance Company, Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hartford Insurance)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1356785 ), filed by Nubia Mazzarese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Morse, Mark) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Insurance Company, Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hartford Insurance)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1356785 ), filed by Nubia Mazzarese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Morse, Mark) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzarese v. Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubia Mazzarese
Represented By: Mark B. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean E. Tomasco
Represented By: Dana M. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mashantucket Pequot Tribal Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?