Loens v. Walgreens Company, et al
Plaintiff: Charles Loens
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreens Company-Paid Disability Plan for Salaried Team Members, Pharmacists and Registered Nurses and Walgreens Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00268
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER : Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Company.(Magratten, Brooks)
June 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. answer due 6/28/2019; Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. answer due 6/28/2019; Walgreens Company answer due 6/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #10 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to #1 Complaint filed by Walgreens Company, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/21/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly A. Jones. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/4/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Kimberly A. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1373219 ) filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for extension of time (answer due June 28, 2019) filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Company identifying Corporate Parent Walgreen Co., Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Other Affiliate Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Sedgwick, L.P., Other Affiliate Lightning Caymen Merger Sub, Ltd., Other Affiliate Stone Point Capital, CDPQ, Other Affiliate The Carlyle Group for Walgreens Company.. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Company (Magratten, Brooks)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Loens as to Defendant Walgreens Company-Paid Disability Plan for Salaried Team Members, Pharmacists and Registered Nurses (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Waring, Mason)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Loens. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Waring, Mason)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Loens. Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Waring, Mason)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Walgreens Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sedgwick Claims Management Services)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1358155 ), filed by Charles Loens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plan Summons, #3 Walgreens Summons, #4 Sedgwick Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1358155 ), filed by Charles Loens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plan Summons, #3 Walgreens Summons, #4 Sedgwick Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loens v. Walgreens Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company-Paid Disability Plan for Salaried Team Members, Pharmacists and Registered Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Loens
Represented By: J. Scott Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?