Stafford v. CSL Plasma, LLC

Plaintiff: Phyllis Stafford
Defendant: CSL Plasma, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00270
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 9/12/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/14/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/14/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 12/13/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 1/13/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/12/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 6/12/2019; Jesse W. Duarte, Michael Joseph Beagan and Eric B. Mack participated (Barletta, Barbara)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Phyllis Stafford. (Beagan, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Co-counsel by Jesse W. Duarte on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duarte, Jesse)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by CSL Plasma, LLC in support of #7 Rule 16 Statement . (Mack, Eric)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by CSL Plasma, LLC. (Mack, Eric)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell on behalf of CSL Plasma, LLC (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 6/12/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by CSL Plasma, LLC.(Mack, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Plasma, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CSL Behring, LLC, Corporate Parent CSL Limited for CSL Plasma, LLC.. (Mack, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-4845. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1358417, filed by CSL Plasma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mack, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Plasma, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CSL Behring, LLC, Corporate Parent CSL Limited for CSL Plasma, LLC.. (Mack, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-4845. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1358417, filed by CSL Plasma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mack, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. CSL Plasma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Plasma, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Mack
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Stafford
Represented By: Michael Joseph Beagan
Represented By: Jesse W. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?