Studley v. Jacobowitz et al

Plaintiff: David Studley
Defendant: Pearl H. Jacobowitz and Irwin Jacobowitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00276
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/26/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Studley (Hart, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. #6 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Record on Appeal)(Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #7 under Fed. R. Appellate Proc. 24 is DENIED. The Court certifies that this appeal is not taken in good faith and any issues to be raised are frivolous. The Defendants improperly removed this eviction case from state district court. This Court had no jurisdiction over the case no federal question, no diversity. Any appeal from this Courts remand would be frivolous - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/12/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 7, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-1579 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Pearl H. Jacobowitz, Irwin Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b). #6 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(Potter, Carrie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz as to Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 6/12/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dated May 14, 2019 #4 is DENIED. This Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this dispute. There is no federal question presented and the parties are not from different states. This matter should be litigated in Rhode Island state court. The Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed Without Payment of fees #5 is therefore DENIED as moot. (Perry, Frank)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. Responses due by 6/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Record)(Potter, Carrie)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This matter is remanded to the state court for the reasons stated by this Court in Studley v. Jacobowitz, 19-cv-86 12 . - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 14, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-86-JJM this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the defendant to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 6/3/2019. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/13/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/13/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
May 13, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-84 and 19-cv-86 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court, case number 3CA-2019-03068., filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the defendant to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 6/3/2019. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/13/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/13/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
May 13, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-84 and 19-cv-86 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court, case number 3CA-2019-03068., filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Studley v. Jacobowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Studley
Represented By: Steven J. Hart
Represented By: Kayla E. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl H. Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?