Gillooly v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Nancy Gillooly
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00277
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Amendment to #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Horton, Dana)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Sever and Stay Bad Faith Claim and Discovery filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Horton, Dana)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Casualty Insurance Company.. (Horton, Dana)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Horton, Dana)
June 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: USAA Casualty Insurance Company answer due 7/5/19. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/21/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint re extension to responsive pleading deadline filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. Horton on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Horton, Dana)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Gillooly. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Foley, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1363093 ), filed by Nancy Gillooly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Foley, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1363093 ), filed by Nancy Gillooly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Foley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillooly v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana M. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gillooly
Represented By: John S. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?