Saltzman v. Whisper Yacht, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Robert B Saltzman
Defendant: s/y Whisper, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC and Whisper Yacht, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by All Defendants re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for partial summary judgment, #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Motion for partial summary judgment, #19 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ben Osborn, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Captain Simon Davison)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Motion for partial summary judgment filed by Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Whisper Yacht, Ltd., s/y Whisper in support of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for partial summary judgment . (Aarsheim, Kirby)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for partial summary judgment filed by Whisper Yacht, Ltd., s/y Whisper. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Aarsheim, Kirby)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Whisper Yacht, Ltd. re #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Set/Reset Deadlines, #14 Order, #1 Complaint, (Aarsheim, Kirby)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File; defendants have up to 7/12/19 to file a Statement of Interest and to respond to the complaint- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/10/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Statement of Interest in the Vessel, MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Order filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: in light of discrepancy between address on docket and address in joint motion, counsel for Defendant is requested to advise the Clerks Office which is the address of record for purposes of this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/17/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Stipulation and ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/17/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Order Re Vessel Arrest (Joint Motion on Consent With Stipulation and Proposed Order). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/17/19. (Saucier, Martha)
June 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Order Re Vessel Arrest (Joint Motion on Consent With Stipulation and Proposed Order) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 15, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Order Re Vessel Arrest (Joint Motion on Consent With Stipulation and Proposed Order) filed by Robert B Saltzman. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Fulweiler, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B Saltzman. Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Fulweiler, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B Saltzman. Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Fulweiler, John)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/30/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT IN REM Issued as to s/y WHISPER (Official # 71042). (Saucier, Martha)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/30/19. (Saucier, Martha)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby L. Aarsheim on behalf of Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, Whisper Yacht, Ltd., s/y Whisper (Aarsheim, Kirby)
May 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Ex Parte), #5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Ex Parte) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Robert B Saltzman (Fulweiler Declaration re Service on U.S. Marshal Identifying Corrected Email Address) (Fulweiler, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Ex Parte) filed by Robert B Saltzman. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 (Proposed form of Declaration to be Executed by Security Service), #3 Proposed Order)(Fulweiler, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Ex Parte) filed by Robert B Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Warrant of Arrest)(Fulweiler, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, Whisper Yacht, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1365572 ), filed by Robert B Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, #5 Summons - Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, #6 Summons - Whisper Yacht, Ltd.)(Fulweiler, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, Whisper Yacht, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1365572 ), filed by Robert B Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, #5 Summons - Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, #6 Summons - Whisper Yacht, Ltd.)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saltzman v. Whisper Yacht, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: s/y Whisper
Represented By: Kirby L. Aarsheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC
Represented By: Kirby L. Aarsheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kirby L. Aarsheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whisper Yacht, Ltd.
Represented By: Kirby L. Aarsheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B Saltzman
Represented By: Robert T. Karns
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?