Numerosi v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.

Plaintiff: Grace Numerosi
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00286
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:18-cv-11787. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred to to District of Rhode Island;. Original file with documents numbered 1-23, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Simeone, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 15) entered. Because personal jurisdiction over Wyndham clearly exists in the District of Rhode Island, the Court TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island.For the foregoing reasons, Wyndhams motion to dismiss, Doc. No. 15, is ALLOWED to the extent that the case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island for further proceedings. The remainder of Wyndhams motion is DENIED without prejudice to the renewal in the District of Rhode Island.Numerosis motion to compel, Doc. No. 19, remains pending. Wyndham shall within fourteen days either (1) respond to the motion to compel or (2) produce the documents sought and seek to have the motion terminated as moot.The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island (Simeone, Maria)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #19 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Joseph M. Orlando, Jr on behalf of Grace Numerosi by on behalf of Grace Numerosi. Related document: #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Grace Numerosi, #19 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Grace Numerosi.(Orlando, Joseph)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Grace Numerosi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlando, Joseph)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Grace Numerosi.(Orlando, Joseph)
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 Plaintiff's Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Grace Numerosi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Montes, Mariliz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Grace Numerosi. B)(Orlando, Joseph) (Main Document 17 replaced on 5/3/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 5/3/2019 to detach memorandum and its exhibits from opposition and re-docket as a new entry (see. Doc. 18) (Montes, Mariliz).
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hennessey, Richard)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc..(Hennessey, Richard)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit disclosure documents)(Hennessey, Richard)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered.(Simeone, Maria)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 1/11/2019; Counsel state the status of the case. The 10 year old child sustained permanent never damage in the hand and severe scarring from a burn received by a treadmill. Counsel discuss liability and damage issues. The court finds the schedule reasonable and adopts the schedule. Initial disclosures by 1/25/19. Amendments to the pleadings by 1/25/19. Fact discovery by 6/25/19. Status conference set for 6/26/19 at 3:00pm. Plaintiffs' trial experts designated by 7/30/19. Deposed by 9/30/19. Defendants' trial experts designated by 8/15/19, deposed by 9/30/19. Dispositive motions by 12/16/19. A scheduling order will issue. ( Status Conference set for 6/26/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.) (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Aylward, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Orlando, Joseph)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING; The Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/19 has been reset for 1/11/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Grace Numerosi. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. Acknowledgment filed by Grace Numerosi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Slip Served)(Chipman, Samuel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference;; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 1/7/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc..(Hennessey, Richard)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant to FCRP 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1(b): This action will be dismissed in twenty-one days unless proof of service is filed. (Simeone, Maria)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 11/20/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7285902 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Grace for Ben Numerosi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix category sheet)(Chipman, Samuel) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2018) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2018) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/22/2018) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Numerosi v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R. Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Numerosi
Represented By: Samuel B. Chipman
Represented By: Joseph M. Orlando, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?