Carvalho v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Carvalho
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A. and Sarah Lindstrom
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Sarah Lindstrom. (Potter, Carrie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Lisa Carvalho. (Goldberg, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sarah Lindstrom, Santander Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Lisa Carvalho. (Goldberg, Brian) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/22/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Lisa Carvalho. (Goldberg, Brian) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/22/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary J. Garland on behalf of Lisa Carvalho (Garland, Hillary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian N. Goldberg on behalf of Lisa Carvalho (Goldberg, Brian)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1366326 ), filed by Lisa Carvalho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldberg, Brian)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary J. Garland on behalf of Lisa Carvalho (Garland, Hillary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian N. Goldberg on behalf of Lisa Carvalho (Goldberg, Brian)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1366326 ), filed by Lisa Carvalho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldberg, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carvalho v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Carvalho
Represented By: Hillary J. Garland
Represented By: Brian N. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?