Dantzler v. State of Rhode Island et al

Petitioner: Kelvin W. Dantzler
Respondent: A.C.I. Department of Corrections and State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2019cv00288
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Correct the Record and Movements Before the Court and Motion for Formal Complaint filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond State of Rhode Island Response due by 7/29/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - DENIED as moot. Petitioner has paid the $5.00 filing fee. #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/27/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - DENIED without prejudice to renewal at a later point in the proceedings #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/27/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - DENIED as premature. The Court has not yet completed its preliminary review as required by Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases and has not yet ordered service of the Petition on the State for the filing of a response. #5 Motion for Hearing; #6 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum; #9 MOTION to Amend and to Conference and Schedule Rule 16, #10 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; #11 MOTION to Assign Hearing Date; #2 MOTION to Assign Hearing Date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/27/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad ,, #5 MOTION for Hearing , #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #9 MOTION to Amend and to Conference and Schedule Rule 16 , #10 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , #2 MOTION to Assign Hearing Date ,, #11 MOTION to Assign referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Assign filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend and to Conference and Schedule Rule 16 filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. (Jackson, Kerrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. (Jackson, Kerrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14670022268 (Potter, Carrie)
May 28, 2019 DOCKET NOTE: Duplicates of PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and MOTION to Assign Hearing Date received by the Clerk's Office on 5/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 6/10/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/20/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith. Corrective Docket Note: Case originally assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan in error. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Assign Hearing Date , filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 6/10/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/20/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith. Corrective Docket Note: Case originally assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan in error. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Assign Hearing Date , filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kelvin W. Dantzler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantzler v. State of Rhode Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelvin W. Dantzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A.C.I. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Christopher R. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?