Tavares v. RI Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Victor A. Tavares
Defendant: RI Superior Court, RI Office of the Attorney General and RI Public Defenders Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv00291
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Victor Tavares (Jackson, Kerrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Victor A. Tavares, #1 Complaint filed by Victor A. Tavares., I recommend that Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF Doc. No. 1) be DISMISSED and that his Application to Proceed IFP (ECF Doc. No. 2) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 5/28/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Kerrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #2 Envelope) (Jackson, Kerrie).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Kerrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #2 Envelope) (Jackson, Kerrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavares v. RI Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor A. Tavares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI Office of the Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI Public Defenders Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?